Gros, Michelle Louise (CPSO#: 76424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Room C2-165
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55115
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

444 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2P2
Canada
Phone: 519-433-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Gros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gros ( CPSO# 76424 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Room C2-165
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LOUISE GROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2007 to 15 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007