Grosett, Oswald Walpole Rock (CPSO#: 25008)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 19 Feb 2013


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a written request to Dr. Grosett's practice address: 324 College Street Toronto, ON M5T 1S3
Date Received: 01 Dec 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2013