Gross, Gil Jay (CPSO#: 54445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7326
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIL JAY GROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1988