Gross, Ian Gary (CPSO#: 29795)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.G. Gross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 35 Amberly Place Gloucester, ON K1J 7J9
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017