Grosser, Elana (CPSO#: 78031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6479
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Grosser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Grosser ( CPSO# 78031 )
Dr. N. Grosser ( CPSO# 22724 )

Business Address:
MCI - The Doctors Office
Suite 203
300 John Street
Richmond Hill ON  L3T 5W3
Phone Number: (905) 764-0188

Business Address:
233 Evans Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 1J6
Phone Number: (416) 252-5885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELANA GROSSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006