Grossman, Lawrence (CPSO#: 21663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B 19
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 222
Fax: (416) 645-1401
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985