Grossman, Loren David (CPSO#: 50646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Diabetes & Endocrinology
St. Michael's Hospital
7th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7424
Fax: (416) 867-3654
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Loren D. Grossman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Grossman ( CPSO# 50646 )

Business Address:
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOREN DAVID GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985