Grossman, Ruth (CPSO#: 102127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit A6
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 736-3505
Fax: (416) 736-4090
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014