Grossman, Stacey Lynn (CPSO#: 79417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-9900
Fax: (905) 707-9907
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stacey Grossman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grossman ( CPSO# 79417 )

Business Address:
Suite 214
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 707-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY LYNN GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008