Grouhi, Masoud (CPSO#: 69470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Iran, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T9
Phone: (905) 884-5638
Fax: (905) 884-8068
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health (York Central)
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-2310
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grouhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grouhi ( CPSO# 69470 )
Dr. S. Grouhi ( CPSO# 80543 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2310

Business Address:
9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 884-5638

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MASOUD GROUHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROUHI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999