Grove-White, Charles Dermot (CPSO#: 26951)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 16 Dec 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 16 Dec 1991

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Dec 1991
Summary:

 In December 1991, Dr. Grove-White pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety 
 with a patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Grove-White guilty of 
 professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Grove-White(s licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16, 1991


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 1991
Summary:

 In June 1991, Dr. Grove-White pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a 
 patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found him guilty of professional 
 misconduct.  The Committee further found Dr. Grove-White guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Grove-White(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 08 Sep 1992
Hearing Date(s): 10 Jun 1991