Grover, Arvinder (CPSO#: 62457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone: (905) 855-1320
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Grover Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grover ( CPSO# 62457 )

Business Address:
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone Number: (905) 855-1320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARVINDER GROVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROVER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991