Grundmann, Hans Gerhard (CPSO#: 29707)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2004