Grundy, Peter Douglas (CPSO#: 59787)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998