Grunebaum, Eyal (CPSO#: 72925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Immunology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue Room 7283
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 1320
Fax: (416) 813-8624
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Aug 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Aug 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Eyal Grunebaum may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Grunebaum  holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will  automatically expire when Dr. Grunebaum no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.