Gruneir, Richard Kenneth (CPSO#: 29984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Gruneir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]

            As from November 1, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Richard K. Gruneir,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gruneir to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Gruneir has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.