Grushka, Daniel Henry (CPSO#: 82457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z2C1
Phone: (519) 433-8424
Fax: (519) 433-5796
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Strathroy Middlesex General
Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Canada
Phone: 519-245-1550 Ext. 5533
Fax: (519) 246-5914
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Alexandra Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-1700
Fax: 519-485-9606
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel H. Grushka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Grushka ( CPSO# 82457 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 458-9606

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Business Address:
Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 433-8424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL HENRY GRUSHKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUSHKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2008