Gruslin, Andree Marie Rolande (CPSO#: 61009)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus Room 8425 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Instructions: All patient files are located in Medical Records at The Ottawa Hospital. Staff physicians in Maternal Fetal Medicine at The Ottawa Hospital and Maternal Fetal Medicine colleagues will care for patients.
Date Received: 01 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014