Gruszczynski, Adam Thomas (CPSO#: 95421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton University Sports Medicine
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PSI Sport Medicine West
1000 Palladium Drive
Box 103
Kanata ON  K2V 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 599-0299
Fax: (613) 599-0298
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM THOMAS GRUSZCZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUSZCZYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2014