Gryfe, Robert Neil (CPSO#: 67006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 455
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5088
Fax: (416) 586-1586
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Gryfe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gryfe ( CPSO# 67006 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
455 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL GRYFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYFE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002