Gryn, David Michael (CPSO#: 82236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Gryn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gryn ( CPSO# 82236 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL GRYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2005 to 03 Apr 2005
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2005 to 01 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2006 to 07 May 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007