Grynspan, David (CPSO#: 92444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Pathology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2691
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Grynspan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Grynspan ( CPSO# 92444 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Pathology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GRYNSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYNSPAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)