Grynspan, Jonathan (CPSO#: 75305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Radiology
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 14558
Fax: (705) 523-7282
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Radiology Department
Sault Area Hospital
969 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C4
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5397
Fax: (705) 759-3663
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Canada
Phone: 705 688 4819
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Grynspan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grynspan ( CPSO# 75305 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
Department of Radiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN GRYNSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYNSPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005