Gudgeon, Alfred Brian (CPSO#: 22526)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.B. Gudgeon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2010