Guenther, Angela Dorothea (CPSO#: 86297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Rouge Hospital
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough
M1W 3W3
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: 416 495 2701
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA DOROTHEA GUENTHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUENTHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2013