Guerin, Andrea Anne (CPSO#: 88337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
Armstrong 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2467 Ext. 1
Fax: (613) 548-1348
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7V 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-7320
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Guerin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Guerin ( CPSO# 88337 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7V 6V4

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
Armstrong 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2467

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA ANNE GUERIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUERIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014