Guerra, Luis Antonio Caldas (CPSO#: 80703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Dec 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Paediatric Urology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1353
Fax: (613) 738-4271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luis Guerra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Guerra ( CPSO# 80703 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Paediatrics Urology
401 Smyth Road
Suite 3344
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 02 Dec 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Luis Antonio Caldas Guerra may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Urology,  University  of  Ottawa, in which Dr. Guerra
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when Dr. Guerra no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.