Guerra Paez, Jose Guillermo (CPSO#: 60393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central Del Ecuador Quito, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Fax: (416) 292-0026
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 201
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 299-6187
Fax: (416) 292-0026
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

20 wynford drive suite 208
Don mills
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 441-2111
Fax: (416) 441-2114
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Albany Medical Clinic
200 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471 Ext. 233
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P2V5
Canada
Phone: 4164952600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Guerra Paez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Guerra Paez ( CPSO# 60393 )

Business Address:
98 Kimbark Boulevard
North York ON  M5N 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 498-8864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE GUILLERMO GUERRA PAEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUERRA PAEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2006