Guerreiro Stucklin, Ana Sofia (CPSO#: 101692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Porto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Switzerland

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Ana  Sofia Guerreiro Stucklin may practise medicine only as required
                  by the clinical  fellowship program in paediatric haematology/oncology in
                  which  Dr.  Guerreiro   Stucklin   is   enrolled  in  the  Department  of
                  Paediatrics, Division of Haematology/Onology;

            2.    Dr. Guerreiro Stucklin shall prescribe drugs  only  for  in-patients  and
                  out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with
                  the  department  where  Dr.  Guerreiro  Stucklin  is  properly practising
                  medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the
                  department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Guerreiro Stucklin shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on June 30, 2018.