Guest, Arthur Barrie (CPSO#: 22413)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004