Guest, Cameron Burton (CPSO#: 63839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4522
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameron Guest Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Guest ( CPSO# 63839 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D108 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMERON BURTON GUEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUEST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992