Guiard, Elsa Cerise (CPSO#: 110402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 16 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Paris, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
200 Elizabeth Streeet
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4257
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELSA CERISE GUIARD may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GUIARD is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. GUIARD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GUIARD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GUIARD shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. GUIARD ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. GUIARD ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2016 to 15 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018