Guindi, Maha Maurice (CPSO#: 55028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Pathology and Lab Medicine
Cedars-Sinai Medical Center
8700 Beverly Blvd.
Los Angeles CA  90048
United States
Phone: (310) 423-1573

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Colorado

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHA MAURICE GUINDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUINDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989