Guindon, Noemie Adeline Everette Bertha (CPSO#: 17169)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Fax: (519) 254-2765
Date Received: 01 May 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1959
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jan 2012

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jan 2012
Summary:

On January 30, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Noémie Adeline Everette Bertha 
Guindon committed an act of professional misconduct, in that: she contravened a term, condition 
or limitation on her certificate of registration; she has failed to maintain the standard of practice 
of the profession; and she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.    
 
During an investigation under section 75(b) of the Code, the College expert reviewed 25 office 
charts from Dr. Guindon's practice and opined that Dr. Guindon's care failed to meet the standard 
of practice in 23 of the 25 patient charts, including, with respect to: her use of UV light as 
treatment for post operative infections, fungal infections, seborrheic dermatitis, chelitis, and 
epidermal cysts; her use of cryotherapy as a treatment for fungal infections, psoriasis, facial 
elastosis, lichen planus pruritus, rosacea, striae distensae, melasma and chelitis; her use of 
intralesional steroid injections as a treatment for xerosis and seborrheic dermatitis; and, her use 
of Accutane as a treatment for an epidermal cyst. 
 
The College expert also observed Dr. Guindon's with 27 patients. The expert opined that Dr. 
Guindon failed to maintain the standard of practice in all 27 patients seen with regard to hand 
hygiene, personal protection and instrument sterilization/reuse, as well as with regard to charting, 
in that she continued to omit the concentration and amount of drug injected. Further, she opined 
that Dr. Guindon's practices had the potential to cause transmission of infection to Dr. Guindon's 
patients or herself.  
 
On November 17, 2010, Dr. Guindon entered into an Undertaking with the College in lieu of an 
order under section 37 of the Code. Dr. Guindon breached her Undertaking and contravened the 
terms, conditions and limitations on her certificate of registration by: using cryotherapy on a 
number of occasions for conditions not permitted under the terms of her Undertaking; failing to 
record the strength and dose for each intralesional injection; and, using intralesional injections 
for treatments not permitted under the terms of her Undertaking. 
 
The Undertaking also required that Dr. Guindon practice under the guidance of a clinical 
supervisor acceptable to the College. Dr. Guindon's clinical supervisor resigned his role as 
supervisor and the supervisory arrangement was terminated on February 23, 2011. Despite not 
having a clinical supervisor, Dr. Guindon saw patients on March 21, 22, 24, 25 and 28, 2011 and 
April 5, 7 and 8, 2011, in breach of her Undertaking and in contravention of the terms, conditions 
and limitations on her certificate.  
 
On January 24, 2012, Dr. Guindon resigned her membership with the College. She entered into 
an undertaking agreeing not to reapply for membership with the College. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Guindon appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
2.    Dr. Guindon pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 60 days of the date 
      of this Order. 
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 30, 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 24, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Noemie A. E. B. Guindon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I Dr. Guindon:

2) Acknowledge that the College referred allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated October 6, 2010 and October 19, 2011 (the “Notice of Hearing”).
3) Hereby resign from the College effective January 24, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).
4) Hereby undertake not to apply for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
5) Undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the College’s Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as Schedule A. 6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied, for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking.
7) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise. 9) Acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
10) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.