Guinness, Michael Lawrence (CPSO#: 30097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toledo Medical Center
Department of Emergency Medicine
3000 Arlington Ave. Mail Stop 1088
Toledo Ohio 43614
Toledo OH  43614
United States
Phone: (419) 383 6383
Fax: 419 383 3357

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAWRENCE GUINNESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUINNESS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978