Guinness, Richard Mackay (CPSO#: 87562)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 08 Aug 2007 to 28 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 29 Sep 2007 to 29 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Nov 2007