Guiot, Bernard Herman (CPSO#: 61121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 350
7780 South Broadway Street
Littleton CO  80122
United States
Phone: (720) 638-7500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado
USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD HERMAN GUIOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUIOT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008