Guiraudon, Colette Marie (CPSO#: 52024)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008