Guiraudon, Gerard Marcel (CPSO#: 42449)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 07 Apr 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012