Guirgis, Hany Kamal (CPSO#: 43581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 2J6
Phone: (905) 597-6222
Fax: (905) 597-4622
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANY KAMAL GUIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUIRGIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986