Guirguis, Emad Mikhail (CPSO#: 55334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
995 Lakeshore Road East
Oro-Medonte ON  L0L 1T0
Phone: (705) 737-3933
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Guirguis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 06 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 6, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Emad Mikhail Gurguis,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gurguis to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. EMAD MIKHAIL GUIRGUIS
                                          ("Dr. Guirguis")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Guirguis, certificate of registration number 55334, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that the College initiated investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 100199 and 7214811 (the "Investigations") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  thyroid surgery practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and
                  Reports Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake that I will not engage in any of the
                        following areas of practice:
                  
                        (i)   Thyroid surgery.
                  
            (7)   Clinical Supervisor

                  (a)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me once every once every month for the first three
                              (3) months, and once every three (3) months for the following
                              nine (9) months;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts once every
                              month for the first three (3) months, and once every three
                              (3) months for the following nine (9) months, in the area of
                              record-keeping, focusing on my chart completion and the
                              accuracy and timeliness of my clinical notes and records;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Guirguis, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Guirguis, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (7)(f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    airway management, specifically, an accredited course
                                    in airway management.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to complete this requirement by July 31,
                        2017 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it.  I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College.
                  
            (10)  Workplace Reporting

                  (a)   I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge and agree that the person who is the
                        Chief of Staff, Chief of Surgery, or other person in a comparable
                        role at Stephenson Memorial Hospital who is acceptable to the
                        College (the "Hospital Monitor"), will be required to execute an
                        undertaking in the form attached hereto as Appendix "B".  I have
                        reviewed this undertaking and understand what is required of the
                        Hospital Monitor which includes, without limiting the generality of
                        the foregoing:
                  
                        i.    written reports to the College once every three (3) months
                              for one (1) year;
                  
                        ii.   such reports to include information regarding my record
                              completion and patient care, including information provided
                              to the Hospital Monitor by nursing and/or medical staff
                              working directly with me; and
                  
                        iii.  immediate reporting to the College if the Hospital Monitor
                              any concerns that my patients may be at risk of harm or
                              injury; or that I am not in compliance with my Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake that if I begin to practice at any
                        Practice Location other than Stephenson Memorial Hospital within
                        one (1) year of executing this Undertaking, I will consent to the
                        College's obtaining, at its discretion, an undertaking in a similar
                        form to that at Appendix "B" from a colleague with similar
                        responsibilities to the Hospital Monitor approved by the College.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Guirguis, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Guirguis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (17)  I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (19)  I, Dr. Guirguis, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Guirguis was the subject of a College investigation into
                        whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent
                        in his thyroid surgery practice.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        Dr. Guirguis must not practise thyroid surgery;
                  
                        Dr. Guirguis will engage in professional education in airway
                        management for surgeons;
                  
                        Dr. Guirguis will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;
                  
                        Dr. Guirguis's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected
                        by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision; and
                  
                        The College will receive reports from Stephenson Memorial Hospital,
                        or other Practice Locations approved by the College, regarding Dr.
                        Guirguis's record completion and patient care.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Guirguis, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Emad Mikhail Guirguis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 14, 2017:

Dr. Guirguis was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his thyroid surgery practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Guirguis must not practise thyroid surgery;

Dr. Guirguis will engage in professional education in airway management for surgeons;

Dr. Guirguis will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

Dr. Guirguis’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision; and

The College will receive reports from Stephenson Memorial Hospital, or other Practice Locations approved by the College, regarding Dr. Guirguis’s record completion and patient care.