Guise, Roxan Marie (CPSO#: 64087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone: (905) 356-2236
Fax: (905) 356-2568
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROXAN MARIE GUISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUISE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1991 to 14 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1993