Gulasingam, Sivakumar Anandan (CPSO#: 95387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lyndhurst SCI Rehabilitation Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Health Network
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 6133
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rumsey Cardiac Rehab Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Health Network
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 2V6
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 5300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Family Medical Centre
Unit 10 - 2677 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T3H8
Canada
Phone: 4164127300
Fax: 4164123400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sivakumar Gulasingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gulasingam ( CPSO# 95387 )

Business Address:
Lyndhurst SCI Rehabilitation Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Room 201-1
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIVAKUMAR ANANDAN GULASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULASINGAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016