Gulati, Sanjeev (CPSO#: 74069)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2004