Gulavita, Sunil Premlal Pushpakumar (CPSO#: 56464)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ceylon, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre 980 Oliver Rd Thunderbay, ON P7B 6V4
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017