Gulenchyn, Karen Yvonne (CPSO#: 30746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
H S C-1P15
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73452
Fax: (905) 546-1125
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St Joseph's Healthcare
System Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Y. Gulenchyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gulenchyn ( CPSO# 30746 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
1P15 - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN YVONNE GULENCHYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULENCHYN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979