Gulka, Irene Billie (CPSO#: 65667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Ravenglass Cres
London, Ontario
London ON  N6G 4K1
Phone: (519) 858-2128
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 3203
Fax: (519) 663-8803
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irene B. Gulka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Gulka ( CPSO# 65667 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital - Department of Radiology
339 Windermere Road
Lindsay ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3203

Business Address:
60 Ravenglass Crescent
London ON  N6G 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 858-2128

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE BILLIE GULKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 1996 to 23 Feb 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1996