Gunapalan, Lalitha (CPSO#: 81485)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Colombo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2010