Gunaratnam, Lakshman (CPSO#: 77663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Jennifer Rombouts
London Health Sciences Centre-UH
Room A10-208
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3632
Fax: (519) 663-3449
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lakshman Gunaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gunaratnam ( CPSO# 77663 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Road
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3632

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3632

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Lakshman Gunaratnam may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of  Neurology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
                        Gunaratnam  holds  an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Gunaratnam
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.