Gunawardena, Sinhapalage Yamuna Krishanthi (CPSO#: 81617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Spanish

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Richmond Hill Kids clinic
York Medical, Unit 412
1650 Elgin Mills Rd E.
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 884-3000 Ext. 300
Fax: (905) 884-4821
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Hospital ( YCH)
10, Trench Street,
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-2060
Fax: (905) 883-2022
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krishanthi Gunawardena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gunawardena ( CPSO# 81617 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2060

Business Address:
North Richmond Hill Kids Clinic
412 - 1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 884-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SINHAPALAGE YAMUNA KRISHANTHI GUNAWARDENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNAWARDENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2004 to 15 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2010